Aptitude - Number System Online Quiz


Advertisements

Following quiz provides Multiple Choice Questions (MCQs) related to Number System. You will have to read all the given answers and click over the correct answer. If you are not sure about the answer then you can check the answer using Show Answer button. You can use Next Quiz button to check new set of questions in the quiz.

Questions and Answers

Q 1 - What is the result of the following?

 4 + 44 + 444 + 4.44 

A - 486.44

B - 444

C - 496.44

D - 44

Answer : C

Explanation

496.44

Q 2 - (568 x 568 x 568 + 432 x 432 x 432) / (568 x 568 - 568 x 432 + 432 + 432) = ?

A - 568

B - 1000

C - 432

D - 10

Answer : B

Explanation

This is solved using the following formulae:
(a3 + b3) = (a + b)( a2 - ab + b2)
The value of (a+b) =
(a3 + b3) / ( a2 - ab + b2) =
(568 + 432) = 1000

Q 3 - On dividing a number by 56, we get remainder as 29. On dividing the same number by 8, what will be the remainder?

A - 5

B - 11

C - 7

D - 6

Answer : A

Explanation

Let p = number and q = quotient
p = 357 x q + 39
= (17 x 21 x q) + (17 x 2) + 5
= 17 x 921y + 2 ) + 5
Remainder = 5

Q 4 - How many terms are there in the G.P 3, 6, 12, ... , 768?

A - 8

B - 9

C - 7

D - 10

Answer : B

Explanation

a = 3, r = 62 = 2
Let number of terms = n
-> tn = 768
-> 768 = arn-1
-> 768 = 3 x 2n-1
-> 7683 = 2n-1
-> 256 = 2n-1
-> 28 = 2n-1
-> n = 9
Therefore number of terms = 9

Q 5 - I how many ways can 22500 be written as a product of two different factors?

A - 10

B - 32

C - 22

D - 12

Answer : C

Explanation

1502 = 22500
Therefore, 1502 = ((2)(5)(3)(5))2 = 225432
= 12{(2 + 1)(4 + 1)(2 + 1) - 1}
= 22

Q 6 - What is the unit digit in in 7105?

A - 5

B - 7

C - 9

D - 1

Answer : B

Explanation

 Unit digit in (7)105 = unit digit in (74)26 x 71 = unit digit in (1 x 7) = 7 Thus Unit digit in (7)105 is 7.

Q 7 - 1014 x 986 = y. What is y?

A - 988804

B - 998814

C - 998904

D - 999804

Answer : D

Explanation

 y =1014 x 986 = 1014 x (1000 - 14) = 1014000 - 14196 = 999804  

Q 8 - 106 x 106 + 94 x 94 = y. What is y?

A - 20052

B - 20062

C - 20072

D - 20042

Answer : B

Explanation

  y = 106 x 106 + 94 x 94    = (106)2 + (94)2  = (100 + 6)2 + (100 -6)2  Using formulae (a+b)2 = a2 + b2 + 2ab and  (a-b)2 = a2 + b2 - 2ab  (a+b)2 + (a-b)2 = 2(a2 + b2)  ∴ y = 2 x [(100)2 + (6)2]  = 2 x [10000 + 36]  = 2 x 10036  = 20072  

Q 9 - What is the first prime number?

A - 0

B - 1

C - 2

D - 3

Answer : C

Explanation

2 is the first prime number.

Q 10 - How many numbers are divisible by all 4,5 and 6 lying between 200 and 600.

A - 5

B - 6

C - 7

D - 8

Answer : B

Explanation

Each number should be divisible by L.C.M. of 4, 5 and 6 i.e. 60. So numbers are 240, 300, 360, 420, 480, 540. Count: 6

Advertisements